This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 08:19:39 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC assignee of Synchrony Bank vs.Annette Dukes

Case Summary

On 07/28/2018 Cavalry SPV I LLC assignee of Synchrony Bank filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Annette Dukes. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0550

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

DUKES, ANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE ESQ

Defendant Attorney

VEAL, JENNIFER MILLER ESQ

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

7/28/2018: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Motion to Appoint Process Server

7/28/2018: Motion to Appoint Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

8/10/2018: Order Appointing Process Server

Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS as Counsel for Defendant

9/10/2018: Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS as Counsel for Defendant

20 Day Summons Issued as to Annette Dukes; efiled

7/30/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Annette Dukes; efiled

Civil Cover Sheet

7/28/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/9/2020 2:55 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020001556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: 12/21/2018 Order Approving Stip & Closing File, Order Approving Stip & Closing File (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Adopt Settlement Stipulation (attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion For Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer/Affirmative Defenses by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS as Counsel for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Served Summons to Annette Dukes on 8.18.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Annette Dukes; efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L