This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 00:22:40 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Synchrony Bank/ vs.Suzanne Brantley

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Synchrony Bank filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Suzanne Brantley. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0370

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK/

Defendants

BRANTLEY, JOHN E

BRANTLEY, SUZANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE L ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default issued from efile

7/24/2018: Default issued from efile

Motion for Default

7/24/2018: Motion for Default

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to John Brantley

5/22/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to John Brantley

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Suzanne Brantley

5/22/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Suzanne Brantley

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: 08/28/2018 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Proposed Default

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Suzanne Brantley; Individually Served on 6/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to John Brantley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Suzanne Brantley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.