This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 21:05:20 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA vs.CAROLE ZELEK

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CAROLE ZELEK. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0308

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

ZELEK, CAROLE F

Garnishee

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE L ESQ

Garnishee Attorney

FOLMAR, HAYLEY L ESQ

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment of Garnishment

7/26/2019: Final Judgment of Garnishment

Affidavit of Post-Judgment Interest & Costs

5/1/2019: Affidavit of Post-Judgment Interest & Costs

Motion for Final Judgment of Garnishment

5/1/2019: Motion for Final Judgment of Garnishment

Writ of Execution efiled

4/29/2019: Writ of Execution efiled

Miscellaneous

4/29/2019: Miscellaneous

Notice to Defendant

4/8/2019: Notice to Defendant

Default issued from efile

8/22/2018: Default issued from efile

Motion for Default

8/22/2018: Motion for Default

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

5/1/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Final Judgment of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Attorney's fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Post-Judgment Interest & Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Execution efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Writ of Garnishment corp served Heather Ceparano for Vystar on 3/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Served Summons to Carole Zelek on 7.12.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VYSTAR CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.