This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 03:04:33 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC As Assignee of Citibank NA vs. Cathy Whitehead

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 Cavalry SPV I LLC As Assignee of Citibank NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cathy Whitehead. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1225

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

WHITEHEAD, CATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, RICHARD A ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

6/12/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial on 12/11/18 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet Defendant Not Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Unexecuted Summons Returned NON-SERVED SUMMONS TO CATHY WHITEHEAD ON 6.26.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial on 8/7/18 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less