This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 21:28:05 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK vs ROSE PRYER

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROSE PRYER. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2419

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

PRYER, ROSE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE ESQ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

4/30/2019: Certificate of Service

Civil Cover Sheet

11/14/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: 04/04/2019 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet FTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Individually Served 12/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial set for 01/15/2019 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less