This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/11/2023 at 17:03:08 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. HEIGL, LIESELOTTE

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEIGL, LIESELOTTE. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1040

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

HEIGL, LIESELOTTE

THE RETREAT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LIESELOTTE HEIGL

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, COREY M ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED

5/12/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

5/12/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

5/12/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #193262

5/12/2023: PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #193262

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

5/12/2023: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

6/1/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 6/5/2023 2:13 PM / RECEPTION #: 2023027541

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #193262

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/15/2023 10:03 AM / RECEPTION #: 2023023578

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/12/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA001040

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less