This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:55:20 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER vs.THOMAS BREWSTER

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against THOMAS BREWSTER. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0777

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER

Defendants

BREWSTER, THOMAS

GIBERSON, ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/15/2018: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/15/2018: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Motion to Appoint Process Server

10/15/2018: Motion to Appoint Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

10/25/2018: Order Appointing Process Server

Default

3/22/2019: Default

Default Proposed

3/22/2019: Default Proposed

Motion for Default

3/22/2019: Motion for Default

20 Day Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Giberson

10/16/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Giberson

20 Day Summons Issued as to Thomas Brewster

10/16/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Thomas Brewster

Civil Cover Sheet

10/15/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 11/27/2019 1:09 PM / RECEPTION #: 2019063415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service summons individually served 11/1/18 as to Thomas Brewster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Giberson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Thomas Brewster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASCADE CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C