This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:03:12 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER vs.BADIHA RICHA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2018 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BADIHA RICHA. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0749

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER

Defendants

RICHA, BADIHA

RICHA, NEHME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (SECOND SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

2/11/2020: DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (SECOND SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (SECOND SUBMISSION)

2/11/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (SECOND SUBMISSION)

DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (FIRST SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

4/10/2019: DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (FIRST SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

Default Proposed

4/10/2019: Default Proposed

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (FIRST SUBMISSION)

4/10/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (FIRST SUBMISSION)

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Badiha Richa

10/8/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Badiha Richa

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Nehme Richa

10/8/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Nehme Richa

Civil Cover Sheet

10/7/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CC000749, CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE OF SANTANDER CONSUMER VS.BADIHA RICHA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS DEFAULT-2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY (SECOND SUBMISSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (SECOND SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (SECOND SUBMISSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ISSUED FROM EFILE (FIRST SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY (FIRST SUBMISSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (FIRST SUBMISSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Badiha Richa; SubServed on 10/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Nehme Richa; SubServed on 10/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Badiha Richa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Nehme Richa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASCADE CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C