This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 14:44:22 (UTC).

Ben Baggs, III vs. Tonya Price

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 Ben Baggs, III filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tonya Price. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1972

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGGS, BEN H III

Defendants

PRICE, TONYA

MATCHETT, JASON

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

11/30/2017: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

Receipt Court Costs Clerk's fee plus CCSO fee

11/15/2017: Receipt Court Costs Clerk's fee plus CCSO fee

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: 12/04/2017 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed as to Tonya Price; Posted on 11/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed as to John Matchett; Posted on 11/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Receipt Court Costs Clerk's fee plus CCSO fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued sent to CCSO w/ $; as to Tonya Price

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Three Day Notice to Pay/Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous re: Lease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Plaintiff's Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued sent to CCSO w/ $; as to Jason Matchett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less