This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/12/2020 at 07:57:49 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs JACK DYES, Jr.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JACK DYES, Jr. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0673

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

DYES, JACK W JR

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF JACK W DYES JR

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK W DYES JR

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGENDORF, IAN

 

Court Documents

Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

6/29/2017: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

Motion for Default/Default as to Jack W. Dyes

10/9/2017: Motion for Default/Default as to Jack W. Dyes

Notice of Dropping Party

8/25/2017: Notice of Dropping Party

Affidavit of Attorney's Fees

8/25/2017: Affidavit of Attorney's Fees

Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

8/25/2017: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

Motion for Default/Default with proposed default

8/23/2017: Motion for Default/Default with proposed default

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

6/29/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Jack Dyes Jr.

6/29/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Jack Dyes Jr.

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Jack Dyes Jr.

6/29/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Jack Dyes Jr.

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant 1

6/29/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant 1

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

6/29/2017: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

6/29/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Directing Clerk of Courts to Release Original Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Original Note/Mortgage Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal and Discharge of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Release Original Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default/Default as to Jack W. Dyes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Hearing 09-27-17 at 9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Original Affidavit of Lost Note

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jagendorf, Ian D