This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 12:02:18 (UTC).

Autovest Financial Services LLC vs.Shier Sindhu

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Autovest Financial Services LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Shier Sindhu. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0653

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

SINDHU, SHIER KHALID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE L ESQ

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

8/30/2018: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Motion to Appoint Process Server

8/30/2018: Motion to Appoint Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

9/19/2018: Order Appointing Process Server

12/26/2018 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

12/26/2018: 12/26/2018 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

Default issued from efile

11/15/2018: Default issued from efile

Motion for Default with Proposed Default

11/15/2018: Motion for Default with Proposed Default

20 Day Summons Issued

8/31/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: 12/26/2018 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default with Proposed Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service SubServed on 9/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autovest Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.