This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 04:25:51 (UTC).

Autovest Financial Services LLC vs.Lois Smith

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 Autovest Financial Services LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Lois Smith. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0348

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

SMITH, LOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOSELLE, ROBIN SOBO

LAVRAR, FLYNN

Defendant Attorney

BARBER, SEAN C.

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

12/1/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

Answer/Affirmative Defenses

9/28/2018: Answer/Affirmative Defenses

Affidavit /Return Service executed summons sub srvd Vanessa Vazquez fo Lois Smith on 7/11/17

7/14/2017: Affidavit /Return Service executed summons sub srvd Vanessa Vazquez fo Lois Smith on 7/11/17

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/25/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR COURT ORDERD MEDIATION

11/19/2019: MOTION FOR COURT ORDERD MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A

1/16/2020: NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

1/16/2020: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM ON 01/11/2021 10:00 AM

12/4/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM ON 01/11/2021 10:00 AM

ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

1/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

Notice of Hearing 6/25/18 @ 3:45pm on Motion to Dismiss for Failing to State a Cause of Action

5/18/2018: Notice of Hearing 6/25/18 @ 3:45pm on Motion to Dismiss for Failing to State a Cause of Action

Order (Generic) Plaintiff has 30 days to Amend Complaint or Dismiss on this Order

8/28/2018: Order (Generic) Plaintiff has 30 days to Amend Complaint or Dismiss on this Order

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 1/11/21 @ 10:00 AM

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 1/11/21 @ 10:00 AM

Amended Complaint

9/18/2018: Amended Complaint

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND APPOINTING MEDIATOR

12/5/2019: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND APPOINTING MEDIATOR

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION - 12/4/19 AT 10:30AM

11/20/2019: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION - 12/4/19 AT 10:30AM

Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

7/27/2017: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

6/12/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION AND APPOINTING MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • HearingEvent: Motion for Mediation; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Division C Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION - 12/4/19 AT 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR COURT ORDERD MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Response DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Hearing 6/25/18 @ 3:45pm on Motion to Dismiss for Failing to State a Cause of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Dismiss/Vacate FOR FAILING TO STATE A CAUSE OFACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service executed summons sub srvd Vanessa Vazquez fo Lois Smith on 7/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autovest Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barber, Sean Christopher