This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 15:09:18 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs.WILLIAM MANESS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 American Express National Bank filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAM MANESS. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0181

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

MANESS, WILLIAM E

Garnishees

SUNTRUST BANK

US BANK NA

CITIBANK

GANNETT MHC INC

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT E

Garnishee Attorneys

BARRY, JOHN A

URSINI, LOUIS M III

AYERS, W PATRICK ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default issued from efile

6/4/2018: Default issued from efile

Default Proposed

6/4/2018: Default Proposed

Motion for Default

6/4/2018: Motion for Default

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

3/15/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

Civil Cover Sheet

3/14/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Dissolving Writ of Garnishment AS TO US BANK NA AS GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee as to US Bank as garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Writ of Garnishment corp served Donna Moch for US Bank on 7/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Garnishment/Continuing Garnishment US Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: Reopen by Other Means

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Garnishment/Continuing Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: Motion/Continuing Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to William Maness; Served via Private Mailbox (FSS 48.31(6); 4/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Plaintiff's Name Change to American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant