This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 17:02:20 (UTC).

ALEXANDER, NEIL vs. CIRCLE K STORES, INC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 ALEXANDER, NEIL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES, INC. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0444

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER, NEIL

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOSTER, TEDDY

GOSEN, RAYMOND J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CIRCLE K STORES

4/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CIRCLE K STORES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #137034

4/29/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #137034

COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SVD CIRCLE K STORES, INC ON 05/03/2022

5/3/2022: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SVD CIRCLE K STORES, INC ON 05/03/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/19/2022 1:41 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022032084

5/18/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/19/2022 1:41 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022032084

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/19/2022 1:41 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022032084

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SVD CIRCLE K STORES, INC ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #137034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CIRCLE K STORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA000444

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSTER, TEDDY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOSEN, RAYMOND J