This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 15:50:48 (UTC).

121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION vs.SCOTT KROKUM

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SCOTT KROKUM. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KROKUM, SCOTT

KROKUM, ANDREW

Garnishee

ADVANCED DISPOSAL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

2/4/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #15369

12/19/2019: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #15369

Default

5/28/2019: Default

Default proposed

5/27/2019: Default proposed

Motion for Default no proposed default attached

5/27/2019: Motion for Default no proposed default attached

Default as to Andrew Krokum

7/16/2018: Default as to Andrew Krokum

Default Proposed

7/13/2018: Default Proposed

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Andrew Krokum

3/19/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Andrew Krokum

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Scott Krokum

3/19/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Scott Krokum

Civil Cover Sheet

3/19/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE / ADVANCE DISPOSAL AKA ADS NFL SGA DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 1/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #15369

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUBPOENA 11/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Andrew Krokum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Scott Krokum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED DISPOSAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L