This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/12/2023 at 06:13:26 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI vs. ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******21CA

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE JOHN A MINCHAK

MINCHAK, J ANDREW

MINCHAK, CHRISTOPHER

MINCHAK, PETER

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KISER, AMY

Other Attorneys

RUDY, JOHN F III

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE JOHN - SERVED - 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE JOHN - SERVED - 03/10/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES - UNSERVED - 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES - UNSERVED - 03/10/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - J ANDREW MINCHAK - SERVED - 03/07/2023

3/8/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - J ANDREW MINCHAK - SERVED - 03/07/2023

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

3/6/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3/6/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OF SERVICE - PETER MINCHAK - SERVED - 02/24/2023

3/1/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - PETER MINCHAK - SERVED - 02/24/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

3/1/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

3/1/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION - SERVED - 02/21/2023

2/27/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION - SERVED - 02/21/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST J ANDREW MINCHAK

2/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST J ANDREW MINCHAK

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN A. MINCHAK

2/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN A. MINCHAK

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JOHN A. MINCHAK DECEASED WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE, WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM INTEREST AS SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, OR OTHER

2/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JOHN A. MINCHAK DECEASED WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE, WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM INTEREST AS SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANT

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/9/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

2/9/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR E-SERVICE FOR THE CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

2/9/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR E-SERVICE FOR THE CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

2/9/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

2/9/2023: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/9/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE JOHN - SERVED - 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES - UNSERVED - 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - J ANDREW MINCHAK - SERVED - 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - PETER MINCHAK - SERVED - 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT - UNSERVED - 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - SEMINOLE LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION - SERVED - 02/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - CHRISTOPHER MINCHAK - SERVED - 02/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST J ANDREW MINCHAK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN A. MINCHAK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST JOHN A. MINCHAK DECEASED WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE, WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM INTEREST AS SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR E-SERVICE FOR THE CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/09/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000221CA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less