This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/05/2023 at 11:05:42 (UTC).

TENNANT, PATRICK vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 TENNANT, PATRICK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******34CA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TENNANT, PATRICK

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, NICHOLAS T

Defendant Attorneys

TABOADA-MCGILL, ALEXANDR M

BARI, GENELLE MARIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PATRICK TENNANT - JUNE 13, 2023 @ 01:30 P.M.

5/11/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PATRICK TENNANT - JUNE 13, 2023 @ 01:30 P.M.

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/10/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

5/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

4/24/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY ALEXANDRA M. TABOLDA-MCGILL, ESQ. FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY ALEXANDRA M. TABOLDA-MCGILL, ESQ. FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

3/30/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

3/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

2/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

2/21/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

2/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

2/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/21/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

2/21/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: COMPLAINT

STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

2/21/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - PATRICK TENNANT - JUNE 13, 2023 @ 01:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY ALEXANDRA M. TABOLDA-MCGILL, ESQ. FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PATRICK TENNANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less