This case was last updated from Charlotte County Courts on 08/07/2023 at 23:40:45 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC AAO PHILLIP VIVLAMORE vs. CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC AAO PHILLIP VIVLAMORE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County Courts, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL, PETER A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******16SP

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL, PETER A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC AAO PHILLIP VIVLAMORE

Defendant

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINSON, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

HIRSCHKOWITZ, MICHAEL STEVEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TOFLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(B)(I)(A)

5/26/2023: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TOFLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(B)(I)(A)

SUMMONS REQUEST

5/26/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

5/26/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

5/26/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023028612

5/26/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023028612

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

6/7/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

6/15/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM ANDNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED ELECTRONIC MAIL SERVICE ADDRESSE

6/23/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM ANDNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED ELECTRONIC MAIL SERVICE ADDRESSE

NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/09/2023 @ 09:00 AM

7/10/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/09/2023 @ 09:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

07/11/2023

HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS PTC; Judge: BELL, PETER A; Location: VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/09/2023 @ 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM ANDNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED ELECTRONIC MAIL SERVICE ADDRESSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023028612

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TOFLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(B)(I)(A)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000816SP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less