This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/01/2023 at 04:04:30 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC vs. UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNE. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******31CA

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNE

KULICH, WAYNE DAVID

KULICH, CAROLYN K

KULICH, GLENN ROBERT

KULICH, EILEEN MARIE

SHEEHAN, MARJORIE ANN

SHEEHAN, KARL FRANCIS

CARRANO, JR., JAMES BEN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES BEN CARRANO, JR.

CARRANO, JR., ROMEO J

CARRANO, MELISSA ANN

KINGSLEY, MARIA ELENA

KINGSLEY, SR., DAVID ALLEN

BAKER, HAROLD W

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HAROLD W. BAKER

RANGER, GLENN RICHARD

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLENN RICHARD RANGER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE C

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIN-DUNCAN, KARISSA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3267101)

5/19/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3267101)

PAYMENT $1,297.50 RECEIPT #2023027568

5/18/2023: PAYMENT $1,297.50 RECEIPT #2023027568

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE COMMISSIONER OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT;

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE COMMISSIONER OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT;

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLENN RICHARD RANGER

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLENN RICHARD RANGER

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST GLENN RICHARD RANGER

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST GLENN RICHARD RANGER

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HAROLD W. BAKER

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HAROLD W. BAKER

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST HAROLD W. BAKER

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST HAROLD W. BAKER

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE E. RANGER AKA MARJORIE E. BAKER AKA MARJORIE ELL

5/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE E. RANGER AKA MARJORIE E. BAKER AKA MARJORIE ELLEN RANGER, DECEASED

CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

5/18/2023: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

5/18/2023: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

5/18/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/18/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

5/18/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

5/18/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3267101)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,297.50 RECEIPT #2023027568

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE COMMISSIONER OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLENN RICHARD RANGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST GLENN RICHARD RANGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HAROLD W. BAKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST HAROLD W. BAKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST DAVID ALLEN KINGSLEY, SR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE E. RANGER AKA MARJORIE E. BAKER AKA MARJORIE ELLEN RANGER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/18/2023 CASE NUMBER 23001931CA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less