This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/12/2023 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

DIEHL, CHERYL vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 DIEHL, CHERYL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******65CA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIEHL, CHERYL

DIEHL, MARK D

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRALDO, OMAR A

OVADIA, ABRAHAM

Defendant Attorney

SCHARF ESQ, STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/14/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/14/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

7/14/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

7/14/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/14/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/14/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

7/14/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

7/14/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035082

7/14/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035082

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

2023-07-28 00:00:00: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

8/7/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

2023-08-16 00:00:00: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

9/5/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035082

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/14/2023 CASE NUMBER 23002665CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less