This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/12/2023 at 06:13:07 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY vs. SAISSELIN, PAUL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SAISSELIN, PAUL. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******73CA

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SAISSELIN, PAUL

SAISSELIN, ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOMBANA, OSCAR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/14/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPOINTMENT OF AN UMPIRE

9/14/2023: PETITION AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPOINTMENT OF AN UMPIRE

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

9/14/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023043147

9/14/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023043147

SUMMONS REQUEST

9/15/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

SUMMONS REQUEST

9/15/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023043185

9/15/2023: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023043185

RETURN OF SERVICE - ANN SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

10/30/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - ANN SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

RETURN OF SERVICE - PAUL SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

10/30/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - PAUL SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - PAUL SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - ANN SAISSELIN SERVED 10/23/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023043185

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023043147

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PETITION AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPOINTMENT OF AN UMPIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/14/2023 CASE NUMBER 23003573CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less