This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/24/2023 at 06:13:03 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******25CA

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

LAPIDUS, CHRISTOPHER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFIN, AMANDA CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorney

RUDY, JOHN F III

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

5/11/2023: AFFIDAVIT - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

5/11/2023: CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS A/K/A CHRISTOPHER HENRY LAPIDUS 05/05/2023

5/10/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS A/K/A CHRISTOPHER HENRY LAPIDUS 05/05/2023

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 05/05/2023

5/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 05/05/2023

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

5/8/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

5/4/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

5/2/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3255555)

4/26/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3255555)

PAYMENT $1,090.00 RECEIPT #2023024191

4/25/2023: PAYMENT $1,090.00 RECEIPT #2023024191

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

4/20/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS

4/20/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS

SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

4/20/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

4/20/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

4/20/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

4/20/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/20/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS A/K/A CHRISTOPHER HENRY LAPIDUS 05/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 05/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE - STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3255555)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,090.00 RECEIPT #2023024191

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/25/2023 CASE NUMBER 23001625CA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED CHRISTOPHER LAPIDUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF CK LAPIDUS FAMILY TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less