This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/18/2023 at 06:12:31 (UTC).

OLSON, THOMAS vs. EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 OLSON, THOMAS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******51CA

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLSON, THOMAS

OLSON, NIKKI

Defendant

EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOVANYECZ, ZOLTAN

Defendant Attorney

SALEHI, TANAZ

Other Attorneys

LOMBANA ESQUIRE, OSCAR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/20/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/20/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

7/20/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

7/20/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035846

7/20/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035846

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/7/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY OSCAR LOMBANA

8/7/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY OSCAR LOMBANA

MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES

8/15/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

2023-08-22 00:00:00: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, NIKKI OLSON

8/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, NIKKI OLSON

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

8/31/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, THOMAS OLSON

8/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, THOMAS OLSON

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS, THOMAS OLSON AND NIKKI OLSON

8/31/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS, THOMAS OLSON AND NIKKI OLSON

DEFENDANTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/5/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

MOTION TO STRIKE - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/6/2023: MOTION TO STRIKE - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/11/2023: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION TO STRIKE - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS, THOMAS OLSON AND NIKKI OLSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, THOMAS OLSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFENDANT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, NIKKI OLSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY OSCAR LOMBANA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023035846

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/20/2023 CASE NUMBER 23002751CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less