This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/26/2023 at 06:25:48 (UTC).

BEHRENS, KARLEEN vs. CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2023 BEHRENS, KARLEEN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******39CA

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEHRENS, KARLEEN

Defendant

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STOCKHAM, DONNA B.

FANTETTI, KELLY A.

Defendant Attorney

MARANTE, NESTOR A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/27/2023: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFSFIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

9/27/2023: PLAINTIFFSFIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

9/27/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

9/27/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/27/2023: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

9/27/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

9/27/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

9/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044735

9/27/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044735

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION FILED BY NESTOR MARANTE, ESQUIRE

10/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION FILED BY NESTOR MARANTE, ESQUIRE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY KELLY A. FANTETTI, ESQUIRE

10/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY KELLY A. FANTETTI, ESQUIRE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/23/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/13/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

11/15/2023: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

DEFENDANT;S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/15/2023: DEFENDANT;S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/16/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT;S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FILED BY KELLY A. FANTETTI, ESQUIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION FILED BY NESTOR MARANTE, ESQUIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044735

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFSFIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/27/2023 CASE NUMBER 23003739CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less