This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/27/2023 at 07:13:45 (UTC).

BERSON, BARBARA vs. EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 BERSON, BARBARA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******66CA

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERSON, BARBARA

Defendant

EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PETTINATO, DAVID

ORLANDO, ANTHONY J

Defendant Attorney

GUTIERREZ, FRANCIE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT @

9/28/2023: COMPLAINT @

SUMMONS REQUEST-ISSUED

9/28/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST-ISSUED

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

9/28/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044911

9/28/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044911

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY ANTHONY J. ORLANDO, ESQ.

9/29/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY ANTHONY J. ORLANDO, ESQ.

PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/29/2023: PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

9/29/2023: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

9/29/2023: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

9/29/2023: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA.R.JUD.ADMIN. 2.516 FILED BY FRANCIE GUTIERREZ, ESQ.

10/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA.R.JUD.ADMIN. 2.516 FILED BY FRANCIE GUTIERREZ, ESQ.

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/19/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

11/9/2023: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

11/9/2023: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

11/15/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/16/2023: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

11/21/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLA.R.JUD.ADMIN. 2.516 FILED BY FRANCIE GUTIERREZ, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS SERVED UPON DEFENDANT WITH COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY ANTHONY J. ORLANDO, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044911

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST-ISSUED EDISON INS CO 9/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/28/2023 CASE NUMBER 23003766CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less