This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2023 at 20:17:12 (UTC).

JABLANSKI, ROBERT vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 JABLANSKI, ROBERT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******06CA

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JABLANSKI, ROBERT

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN, BRETT

Defendant Attorney

DEMAHY, DANIELLE KRISTINE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/17/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/17/2023: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

5/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

5/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

5/17/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023027383

5/17/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023027383

MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

5/31/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

MOTION - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

5/31/2023: MOTION - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ROYCE BADGER, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

6/1/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ROYCE BADGER, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

6/8/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF -

NOTICE OF HEARING - 08/08/2023 @ 09:30 AM

6/12/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING - 08/08/2023 @ 09:30 AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DANIELLE DMAHAY, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

7/12/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DANIELLE DMAHAY, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

7/25/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

7/25/2023: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

7/25/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/2/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DANIELLE DMAHAY, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - 08/08/2023 @ 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ROYCE BADGER, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS - DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023027383

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/17/2023 CASE NUMBER 23001906CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less