This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/09/2023 at 19:59:10 (UTC).

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA vs. ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2023 THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******44CA

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, THE BENEFICIARIES

TENANT # 1, UNKNOWN

TENANT # 2, UNKNOWN

ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON M

Defendant Attorneys

ENGVALSON, KINLEY I

MEADOWS, CAROLYN C

Other Attorneys

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

KITE-POWELL, JULIA BLITON

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINTBY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/26/2023: ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINTBY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

9/26/2023: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION - 8/25/2023, 9/1/2023

9/1/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION - 8/25/2023, 9/1/2023

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

8/28/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

8/24/2023: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

8/24/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

8/24/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

8/24/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E- MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

8/24/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E- MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION, INC.

7/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

7/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

7/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH G. OBEY, DECEASED

7/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH G. OBEY, DECEASED

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE

7/25/2023: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

7/25/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

7/25/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED IN REM COMPLAINT

7/25/2023: VERIFIED IN REM COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINTBY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION - 8/25/2023, 9/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E- MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY CAROLYN C. MEADOWS, ESQ. FOR ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ROTONDA WEST ASSOCIATION, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH G. OBEY, DECEASED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: VERIFIED IN REM COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less