This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/24/2023 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

PITT, GEORGE vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 07/26/2023 PITT, GEORGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******50CA

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITT, GEORGE

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABAN, STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

SCHARF ESQ, STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/25/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

7/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OFFIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

7/25/2023: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OFFIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/25/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/25/2023: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

7/25/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

7/25/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023036697

7/26/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023036697

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANYOF FLORIDA - AUGUST 3, 2023

8/9/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANYOF FLORIDA - AUGUST 3, 2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY STEVEN L. SCHARF, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

8/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY STEVEN L. SCHARF, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

8/28/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY STEVEN L. SCHARF, ESQ FOR DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANYOF FLORIDA - AUGUST 3, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023036697

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 23002850CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OFFIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less