This case was last updated from Charlotte County Courts on 11/14/2023 at 06:11:25 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. vs. BUONOMO, SHERRY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BUONOMO, SHERRY. This case was filed in Charlotte County Courts, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURNS, JOHN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******06SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURNS, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

BUONOMO, SHERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, RICHARD A

Other Attorneys

FAGEN, JESSICA J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/15/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUEST

9/15/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

SUMMONS ISSUED SHERRY BUONOMO

9/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED SHERRY BUONOMO

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023043212

9/15/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023043212

RETURN OF SERVICE - SHERRY BUONOMO - SERVED - 09/21/2023

9/21/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - SHERRY BUONOMO - SERVED - 09/21/2023

STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT, ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

10/18/2023: STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT, ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT, ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS PTC; Judge: BURNS, JOHN L; Location: VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - SHERRY BUONOMO - SERVED - 09/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023043212

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED SHERRY BUONOMO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2023 CASE NUMBER 23001406SP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less