This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/22/2023 at 07:08:02 (UTC).

MORRISSEY, CALEB vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 MORRISSEY, CALEB filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******89CA

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORRISSEY, CALEB

MORRISSEY, BEVONI

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INNOCENT, KIMBERLY ANDREA

Defendant Attorney

O'BRIEN, MATTHEW DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT @

9/22/2023: COMPLAINT @

SUMMONS REQUEST

9/22/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

9/22/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044236

9/22/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044236

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - 9/28/23

9/28/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - 9/28/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY MATTHEW D. O'BRIEN, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

10/2/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY MATTHEW D. O'BRIEN, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/13/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

10/19/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

11/14/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/17/2023: NOTICE - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY MATTHEW D. O'BRIEN, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY - 9/28/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044236

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT: DECLARATORY RELIEF & BREACH OF CONTRACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/22/2023 CASE NUMBER 23003689CA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less