This case was last updated from Charlotte County Courts on 08/07/2023 at 23:41:18 (UTC).

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC D/B/A SHOREPOINT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE vs. MAYANS, MARLENE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC D/B/A SHOREPOINT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against MAYANS, MARLENE. This case was filed in Charlotte County Courts, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL, PETER A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******13SP

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL, PETER A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC D/B/A SHOREPOINT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE

Defendant

MAYANS, MARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUEST

5/26/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST

SUMMONS ISSUED MARLENE MAYANS 07/11/2023 9:30

5/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED MARLENE MAYANS 07/11/2023 9:30

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023028525

5/26/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023028525

RETURN OF SERVICE - MARLENE MAYANS - SERVED - 06/01/2023

6/1/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE - MARLENE MAYANS - SERVED - 06/01/2023

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

7/5/2023: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

7/12/2023: SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3290139)

7/12/2023: SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3290139)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3290139)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SETLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS PTC; Judge: BELL, PETER A; Location: VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURN OF SERVICE - MARLENE MAYANS - SERVED - 06/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023028525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED MARLENE MAYANS 07/11/2023 9:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000813SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less