This case was last updated from Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/15/2023 at 06:18:23 (UTC).

BLONDIN, JOHN vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 BLONDIN, JOHN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Charlotte County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Charlotte County Courthouse located in Charlotte, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GENTILE, GEOFFREY H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******20CA

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Charlotte, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLONDIN, JOHN

BLONDIN, CYNTHIA

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SODANO, NICOLE

Defendant Attorney

CIERVO-CANIZARES ESQUIRE, ANDREA

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT' HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PRIVILEGE LOG

5/10/2023: DEFENDANT' HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PRIVILEGE LOG

DEFENDNAT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/10/2023: DEFENDNAT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

5/10/2023: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/8/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

4/19/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOHN BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 10:00 AM

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOHN BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 10:00 AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CYNTHIA BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 01:00 PM

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CYNTHIA BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 01:00 PM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLORIDA CLAIMS CONSULTANTS - 08/10/2023 @ 10:00 AM

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLORIDA CLAIMS CONSULTANTS - 08/10/2023 @ 10:00 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARCH 22, 2023 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CRAIG BROWN

3/22/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARCH 22, 2023 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CRAIG BROWN

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018215

3/16/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018215

STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

3/16/2023: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION PRIORITY REQUEST

3/16/2023: PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION PRIORITY REQUEST

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/16/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

3/16/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

3/16/2023: SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

COMPLAINT

3/16/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT' HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDNAT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION - HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/22/2023 @ 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOHN BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CYNTHIA BLONDIN - 08/08/2023 @ 01:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLORIDA CLAIMS CONSULTANTS - 08/10/2023 @ 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARCH 22, 2023 - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CRAIG BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION PRIORITY REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/16/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000520CA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less