This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Calhoun County on 02/02/2021 at 19:37:06 (UTC).

COMPTON, BRANDON VS METRIC ENGINEERING INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 COMPTON, BRANDON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against METRIC ENGINEERING INC. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Calhoun County, Calhoun County Courthouse located in Calhoun, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Calhoun, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPTON, BRANDON

Defendants

METRIC ENGINEERING INC

SASNETT, TONJA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM, ETHAN MOON-SIK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING INCS MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY /NON PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANT, TONJA SASNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANT TONJA SASNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING INC'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATOREIS TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON COMPTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING INC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON COMPTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT METRIC ENGINEERING INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO TONJA SASNETT AND METRIC ENGINEERING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO METRIC ENGINEERING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO TONJA SASNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS METRIC ENGINEERING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TONJA SASNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metric Engineering, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM ETHAN M