This case was last updated from Calhoun County Courts on 10/07/2022 at 17:03:18 (UTC).

Bayfront Hma Medical Center LL VS BAKER, LILIAN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 Bayfront Hma Medical Center LL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER, LILIAN. This case was filed in Calhoun County Courts, Calhoun County Courthouse located in Calhoun, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROVER, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Calhoun, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROVER, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bayfront Hma Medical Center LL

Defendant

BAKER, LILIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

09/07/2022:SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/11/2022 09:00; Judge: GROVER, KEVIN; Docket Type: SC PRETRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYFRONT HEALTH ST PETERSBURG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R