This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 09:31:19 (UTC).

STATE VS WILSON MILO LEE JR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILSON MILO LEE JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHRYN C JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

WILSON MILO LEE

Melbourne, FL 32904-6133

WILSON MILO LEE JR

Melbourne, FL 32904-6133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

07/30/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

07/30/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/23/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/05/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/09/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/24/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/24/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

02/19/2020: INFORMATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; User: kmc96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less