This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:04:36 (UTC).

STATE VS WHITEHEAD TANISHA D

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WHITEHEAD TANISHA D. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are AARON J PEACOCK, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

AARON J PEACOCK

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

WHITEHEAD TANISHA DANIELLE

Titusville, FL 32796-3824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/29/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

09/28/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:ARRAIGNMENT; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: cat66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $5,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 657784; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: 5625337075; Amount: $5,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CHILD ABUSE; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 827.03.1-C; Charge Description: FELONY CHILD ABUSE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 827.03.1-C; Charge Description: FELONY CHILD ABUSE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less