This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 09:03:11 (UTC).

STATE VS WEILER GERALD ALLEN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEILER GERALD ALLEN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

WEILER GERALD ALLEN

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

02/01/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

02/01/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/01/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/01/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less