This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 09:30:58 (UTC).

STATE VS WALSH JESSICA CONNIE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WALSH JESSICA CONNIE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID C KOENIG and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID C KOENIG

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

WALSH JESSICA CONNIE

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/16/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/16/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

03/31/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

MOTION TO SUPPRESS

03/05/2020: MOTION TO SUPPRESS

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/02/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

03/02/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

RECALLED FAILURE TO APPEAR WARRANT

02/07/2020: RECALLED FAILURE TO APPEAR WARRANT

ORDER RECALLING WARRANT OR CAPIAS

02/03/2020: ORDER RECALLING WARRANT OR CAPIAS

MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR PRECLUDE

01/31/2020: MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR PRECLUDE

MOTION IN LIMINE

01/31/2020: MOTION IN LIMINE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

12/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/30/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/23/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/23/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/17/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

12/17/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

12/13/2019: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

INFORMATION

12/16/2019: INFORMATION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 11:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: skb69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: sxh57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 03:00 PM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less