This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/25/2020 at 06:12:58 (UTC).

STATE VS WALKER SHANNON DEVON

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WALKER SHANNON DEVON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, THOMAS JAMES BROWN, JUDITH E ATKIN and JAMES H EARP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

WALKER SHANNON DEVON DOC Number - E12316

Melbourne, FL 32935-6440

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

05/22/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

05/01/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

03/10/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT AND SETTING HEARING

03/03/2020: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT AND SETTING HEARING

AMENDED WITNESS LIST

02/18/2020: AMENDED WITNESS LIST

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

01/17/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

MOTION REGARDING FINGERPRINTS

01/09/2020: MOTION REGARDING FINGERPRINTS

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

12/16/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

12/10/2019: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

12/03/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/26/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/26/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/26/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/26/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:STATUS HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; User: kmc96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCAL:STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCR: STATUS HRG CONTD BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Matter Type: STATUS HEARING; Result: CR: STATUS HRG CONTD BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCR: STATUS HRG CONTD BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#31) CONFIDENTIAL COMPETENCY EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 943.0435.4.B.2; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER W TRANSIENT RESIDENCE FAIL TO REPORT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 943.0435.4.B.2; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER W TRANSIENT RESIDENCE FAIL TO REPORT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 943.0435.4.B.2; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER W TRANSIENT RESIDENCE FAIL TO REPORT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 943.0435.14.A.4; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER FAIL TO REPORT OR REGISTER TO SHERIFF; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SEXUAL OFFENSES; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 943.0435.14.C.4-AA; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER FAIL TO REREGISTER AT SHERIFF OFFICE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 943.0435.4.B.2; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER W TRANSIENT RESIDENCE FAIL TO REPORT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 943.0435.4.A; Charge Description: SEX OFFENDER FAIL TO REGISTER ADDRESS W DHSMV; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less