This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 11:30:15 (UTC).

STATE VS VONPLOENNIES WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 01/25/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VONPLOENNIES WILLIAM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, DAVID C KOENIG, JUDITH E ATKIN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

DAVID C KOENIG

JUDITH E ATKIN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

VONPLOENNIES WILLIAM THOMAS JR

Melbourne, FL 32901-4612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/30/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/30/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

01/30/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

01/30/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

01/30/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/26/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/26/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/26/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

01/25/2020: NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/25/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketPLACED WITH LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/24/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.3.A; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF AN OCCUPIED DWELLING; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/24/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.3.A; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF AN OCCUPIED DWELLING; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less