This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 06:36:47 (UTC).

STATE VS SWEENEY JOHN HAMILTON

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SWEENEY JOHN HAMILTON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES G CRAWFORD, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES G CRAWFORD

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SWEENEY JOHN H

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-2623

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

01/21/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

12/03/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

12/02/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

12/02/2019: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/25/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $15,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING ELECTRONIC MONITORING CONDITIONS, COSTS WAIVED, DEFENDANT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.045.1.B-A; Charge Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY ON A PREGNANT PERSON; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/21/2010; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.045.1.B-A; Charge Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY ON A PREGNANT PERSON; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less