This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 09:43:48 (UTC).

STATE VS STEVENS JAMES ROBERT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STEVENS JAMES ROBERT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHRYN C JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

STEVENS JAMES ROBERT

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-7001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

03/10/2020: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/10/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/10/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/02/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/26/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/26/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

02/26/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/26/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/25/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

BENCH WARRANT

02/24/2020: BENCH WARRANT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

02/18/2020: INFORMATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI COCOA BEACH CO; Amount Assessed: $90.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketFTA BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.2.B-A; Charge Description: TRESPASS FAIL LEAVE PROPERTY UPON WARNING BY OWNER; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less