This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 11:57:26 (UTC).

STATE VS SPEAKMAN ROBERT COREY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SPEAKMAN ROBERT COREY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES G CRAWFORD, DAVID C KOENIG, RHONDA E. BABB, KATHRYN C JACOBUS, THOMAS JAMES BROWN, JUDITH E ATKIN and AARON J PEACOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES G CRAWFORD

DAVID C KOENIG

RHONDA E. BABB

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

AARON J PEACOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

SPEAKMAN ROBERT

Palm Bay, FL 32909-9208

SPEAKMAN ROBERT COREY

Palm Bay, FL 32909-9208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

07/24/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/03/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/16/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

03/31/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

03/06/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

03/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

03/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

03/02/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

03/02/2020: INFORMATION

ORDER SETTING BOND

01/31/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/31/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/31/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID C KOENIG; User: lmr62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-T; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF HEROIN; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-BH; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF FENTANYL; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-1; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-T; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF HEROIN; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-BH; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF FENTANYL; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-1; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less