This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 07:49:29 (UTC).

STATE VS SMITH LARRY ELLIOTT

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH LARRY ELLIOTT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RHONDA E. BABB and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RHONDA E. BABB

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SMITH LARRY ELLIOTT

Rockledge, FL 32955-3701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

06/16/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

06/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

05/10/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

04/20/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/01/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

03/23/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/23/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/04/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/04/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/04/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

02/25/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/05/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/05/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

02/05/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/05/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/05/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/05/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 796.07.2.E; Charge Description: PROSTITUTION LEWDNESS OR ASSIGNATION 1ST OFFENSE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 06/16/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 796.07.2.F-A; Charge Description: SOLICITING FOR PRSTNTN LEWDNESS OR ASSIGNATION; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less