This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:02:26 (UTC).

STATE VS SMITH DALTON RAY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH DALTON RAY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SMITH DALTON RAY

Rockledge, FL 32955-8080

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

OSULLIVAN TERRENCE J

2407 Deercroft Dr

Melbourne, FL 32940-6378

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/03/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/03/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/07/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

01/07/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

01/07/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

01/03/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

01/02/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

12/26/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

12/23/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/16/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

12/10/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

11/25/2019: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:PLEA; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: RHONDA E. BABB; User: alb87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: PLEA; Result: CR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 562.11.1.A; Charge Description: SELL GIVE SERVE ALCOHOL TO PERSON UNDER AGE 21; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 562.11.1.A; Charge Description: SELL GIVE SERVE ALCOHOL TO PERSON UNDER AGE 21; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 562.11.1.A-A; Charge Description: SALE OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE TO MINOR; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less