This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:08:18 (UTC).

STATE VS SHRIVER JACQUELINE R

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHRIVER JACQUELINE R. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SHRIVER JACQUELINE ROSE DOC Number - E24807

Titusville, FL 32780-5038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/10/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

03/10/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/24/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

02/13/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/29/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/16/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/16/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/16/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/16/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/18/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI TITUSVILLE CO; Amount Assessed: $77.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $77.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3B; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT WITH 1 PREVIOUS THEFT CONVICTION; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: SHRIVER JACQUELINE ROSE; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688880; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/16/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3B; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT WITH 1 PREVIOUS THEFT CONVICTION; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3B; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT WITH 1 PREVIOUS THEFT CONVICTION; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less