This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 06:03:41 (UTC).

STATE VS SHEEN DANIELLE DEVON

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHEEN DANIELLE DEVON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID C KOENIG and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID C KOENIG

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SHEEN DANIELLE DEVON DOC Number - W80623

Palm Bay, FL 32907-2253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

SCHULTZ ANTHONY

2080 Turtle Mound Rd

Melbourne, FL 32934-8109

SANDERS-RANDALL RONNIE LYNN

3270 Suntree Blvd Ste 204, Bldg A

Melbourne, FL 32940-7505

 

Court Documents

ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

03/18/2020: ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

03/12/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

BOND SURRENDER FORM

03/11/2020: BOND SURRENDER FORM

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

03/11/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/13/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/03/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/17/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

12/17/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

12/12/2019: ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

12/12/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

12/12/2019: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/11/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

12/11/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:PLEA; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID C KOENIG; User: jkb60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: PLEA; Result: CR: PLEA CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCR: PLEA CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: PLEA; Result: CR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 856.021; Charge Description: LOITERING OR PROWLING; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 856.021; Charge Description: LOITERING OR PROWLING; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less