This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/26/2020 at 15:42:38 (UTC).

STATE VS SALANTY AMY CAROL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SALANTY AMY CAROL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

SALANTY AMY CAROL

Cocoa, FL 32927-2319

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/17/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/17/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/17/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/17/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/17/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

02/17/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/17/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/28/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less