This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:07:58 (UTC).

STATE VS ROSE FREDDY WAYNE

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROSE FREDDY WAYNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, RHONDA E. BABB, DAVID C KOENIG, JUDITH E ATKIN, JENNIFER TAYLOR and BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

RHONDA E. BABB

DAVID C KOENIG

JUDITH E ATKIN

JENNIFER TAYLOR

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

ROSE FREDDY WAYNE DOC Number - 143160

Melbourne, FL 32935-4148

ROSE FREDDY WAYNE JR DOC Number - 143160

Melbourne, FL 32935-4148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

WISOKER STEVEN

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way

Viera, FL 32940-

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

07/20/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

07/07/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

06/11/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

06/10/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

06/10/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

06/09/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

04/06/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

04/04/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/05/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

03/05/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

02/28/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/26/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

INFORMATION

02/05/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/30/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

01/30/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/30/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $268.68; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $268.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF CIR; Amount Assessed: $6.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CI; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/05/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.1.F-T; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF HEROIN; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/05/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/05/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-BA; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 28 GRAMS OF COCAINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 3; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.135.1F.1; Charge Description: TRAF AMPHETAMINE OR METHAMPHETAMINE 14 TO 28 GRAMS; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less