This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/13/2020 at 09:37:21 (UTC).

STATE VS ROBINSON GREGGORY L

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON GREGGORY L. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

ROBINSON GREGORY LYDELL DOC Number - E39179

Palm Bay, FL 32905-7413

ROBINSON GREGGORY LYDELL DOC Number - E39179

Palm Bay, FL 32905-7413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

12/03/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON SURETY AND PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND

11/25/2019: ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON SURETY AND PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/25/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

11/25/2019: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

11/25/2019: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

11/25/2019: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

11/25/2019: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 322.34.2B; Charge Description: DRIVING W LICENSE SUSP REV CANC W KNOWLED 2ND CONV; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/12/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.193.3.C.1-B; Charge Description: DUI VEHICLE PROPERTY DAMAGE OR PERSONAL INJURY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/12/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.193.2.B.1-B; Charge Description: FELONY DUI WITHIN 10 YEARS AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/12/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 322.34.2B; Charge Description: DRIVING W LICENSE SUSP REV CANC W KNOWLED 2ND CONV; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.193.3.C.1-B; Charge Description: DUI VEHICLE PROPERTY DAMAGE OR PERSONAL INJURY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.193.2.B.1-B; Charge Description: FELONY DUI WITHIN 10 YEARS AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less